Virginia – Fairfax – Mc Lean
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.banking.us.hsbc.com
Virginia
Fairfax
Mc Lean
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
57890
2004
FDIC Certificate Number: 57890
FDIC's unique number: 429342
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 413208
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24522
Number of Domestic Offices: 479
Number of Foreign Offices: 19
The date of the last data update: 2010-11-30
2004-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association.
2004-07-01 Acquired Hsbc Bank Usa in Buffalo, New York.
2004-07-01 Acquired Hsbc Bank & Trust Company Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2004-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from New Castle, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
2005-03-01 Acquired Bank Of Bermuda Limited in New York City, New York.
2008-12-20 Acquired Hsbc National Bank Usa in Bethesda, Maryland.
2008-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Mc Lean, Virginia.
Total assets: $195,101,367,000
Total deposits: $138,714,227,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $98,701,717,000
Equity capital: $18,507,036,000
Net income: $617,668,000
Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 6.81
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Hsbc Holdings Plc
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association - 108th Street Branch
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association - 120 Broadway Branch
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association - 18816 Northern Boulevard B
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association - 2 Park Avenue Branch
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association - 21st And Fifth Avenue Bran
No associations
LandOfFree
HSBC Bank USA, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with HSBC Bank USA, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and HSBC Bank USA, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9597