Montana – Hill – Havre
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ibyourbank.com
Montana
Hill
Havre
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
20989
1973
FDIC Certificate Number: 20989
FDIC's unique number: 14494
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 606653
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-07-01
1973-03-12 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank Of Havre.
1997-08-20 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1998-06-29 Acquired Traders State Bank Of Poplar Montana in Poplar, Montana.
1998-06-29 Acquired The Citizens State Bank Of Scobey in Scobey, Montana.
2000-12-04 Changed name to Independence Bank .
Total assets: $431,754,000
Total deposits: $366,472,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $366,472,000
Equity capital: $51,355,000
Net income: $3,956,000
Return on Assets: 1.89
Return on Equity: 16.02
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Montana Security, Inc.
Independence Bank - 202 Main Street Branch
Independence Bank - 214 Second Avenue Branch
Independence Bank - Glasgow Branch
Independence Bank - Independence Bank
Independence Bank - Malta Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Independence Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Independence Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Independence Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27426