Independence One Bank, National Association

South Dakota – Pennington – Rapid City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

Bank class

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

Status

inactive

FDIC number

26828

Established

1986

Other info

FDIC Certificate Number: 26828
FDIC's unique number: 36054
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls

Federal Reserve ID Number: 184151
Report Date: 1989-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21034
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

History

1986-11-03 Institution established. Original name: Independence One Bank, National Association.
1990-03-31 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Financial data

Total assets: $86,409,000
Total deposits: $48,767,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Independence One Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Independence One Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Independence One Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10526

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.