New Hampshire – Rockingham – Portsmouth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6249
1855
FDIC Certificate Number: 6249
FDIC's unique number: 4218
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 108102
Report Date: 1977-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1052
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-13
1855-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Indian Head National Bank Of Portsmouth.
1978-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Indian Head Bank, National Association in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1979-11-01 Changed name to Indian Head Bank Of Portsmouth .
1981-01-02 Changed name to Indian Head Bank And Trust Company .
1981-01-02 Acquired Indian Head Bank Of Exeter in Exeter, New Hampshire.
1989-10-01 Changed name to Fleet Bank-nh .
1989-10-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1989-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from Portsmouth, New Hampshire to Nashua, New Hampshire.
1989-10-01 Acquired Indian Head Bank North in Littleton, New Hampshire.
1989-10-01 Acquired Dartmouth National Bank in Hanover, New Hampshire.
1989-10-01 Acquired Indian Head National Bank Of Keene in Keene, New Hampshire.
1989-10-01 Acquired Indian Head National Bank in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1992-01-30 Acquired Atlantic Trust Company in Newington, New Hampshire.
1995-12-30 Acquired Shawmut Bank Nh in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1997-05-23 Moved bank headquarters from Nashua, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $38,034,000
Total deposits: $31,094,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Indian Head National Bank of Portsmouth does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Indian Head National Bank of Portsmouth, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Indian Head National Bank of Portsmouth will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10784