District of Columbia – District of Columbia – Washington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.industrial-bank.com
District of Columbia
District of Columbia
Washington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
14679
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 14679
FDIC's unique number: 9180
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 536527
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-01-28
1934-08-18 Institution established. Original name: Industrial Bank Of Washington.
1992-03-26 Acquired Theodore Roosevelt National Bank in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1995-07-01 Reorganized.
1995-07-01 Changed name to Industrial Bank, National Association .
1995-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Washington, District Of Columbia to Oxon Hill, Maryland.
2007-09-04 Changed name to Industrial Bank .
2007-09-04 Moved bank headquarters from Oxon Hill, Maryland to Washington, District Of Columbia.
2007-09-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-09-04 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
Total assets: $390,132,000
Total deposits: $297,978,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $297,978,000
Equity capital: $32,210,000
Net income: $582,000
Return on Assets: 0.3
Return on Equity: 3.72
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ibw Financial Corporation
Industrial Bank - Anacostia Branch
Industrial Bank - F Street Branch
Industrial Bank - Forestville Branch
Industrial Bank - Industrial Bank
Industrial Bank - Jesse H. Mitchell Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Industrial Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Industrial Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Industrial Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8838