Minnesota – Redwood – Wabasso
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.integritybank.com
Minnesota
Redwood
Wabasso
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15578
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 15578
FDIC's unique number: 9866
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato
Federal Reserve ID Number: 897451
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1934-10-01 Institution established. Original name: Wabasso State Bank.
1999-03-01 Changed name to Integrity Bank Plus .
1999-09-30 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Walnut Grove in Walnut Grove, Minnesota.
Total assets: $52,261,000
Total deposits: $43,364,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $43,364,000
Equity capital: $5,002,000
Net income: $323,000
Return on Assets: 1.28
Return on Equity: 13.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Wabasso Bancshares, Inc.
Integrity Bank Plus - Integrity Bank Plus
Integrity Bank Plus - Sartell Branch
Integrity Bank Plus - Walnut Grove Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Integrity Bank Plus does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Integrity Bank Plus, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Integrity Bank Plus will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15325