Delaware – New Castle – Newark
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Delaware
New Castle
Newark
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26780
1986
FDIC Certificate Number: 26780
FDIC's unique number: 35927
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 61917
Report Date: 1988-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1986-09-02 Institution established. Original name: Interfirst Bank Delaware.
1988-05-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First RepublicBank Delaware in Newark, Delaware.
1988-08-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Delaware Bridge Bank, National Association in Newark, Delaware.
1988-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank in New Castle, Delaware.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
Total assets: $156,367,000
Total deposits: $27,075,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
InterFirst Bank Delaware has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 2.78 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is not bad.
If you have personal experience with InterFirst Bank Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and InterFirst Bank Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Ysnanum
Are you frustrated in life? you think all is lost? No hope from any where? Well i have a good news for you all today, is a pialivlrge that you met the right person. I'm a well known Man which every one knew me to be. My name is Micheal Lancer, i am money lender i assist people financially, because i think enough of all these bankrupt and montages I'm hearing. i want to prove my self to everyone at there. That not everybody are equal.Just send us your personal details:Full Name: .Contact Address: Phone Number: ..Country Code: Amount Needed: ..purpose of loan: .When to pay back: Hope to see your response via this mail address, , . Was this answer helpful?
Was this review helpful to you? Rating [ 2.78 ]
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3525