Texas – Bexar – San Antonio
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Bexar
San Antonio
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
24892
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 24892
FDIC's unique number: 17258
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1002663
Report Date: 1989-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18047
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1983-12-12 Institution established. Original name: Intercontinental National Bank-starcrest.
1986-02-28 Changed name to International Bank Of Commerce, National Association, San An .
1989-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of International Bank of Commerce in Laredo, Texas.
1990-06-29 Acquired Valley Federal Savings Association in Mcallen, Texas.
1991-06-21 Acquired Travis Federal Savings And Loan Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1992-06-25 Acquired Castle Hills National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1994-09-01 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company in Port Lavaca, Texas.
1995-01-31 Acquired Bank Of Corpus Christi in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1995-09-08 Acquired Stone Oak National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1997-11-06 Acquired University Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-12-28 Acquired Nbc Bank, National Association in Eagle Pass, Texas.
2004-06-19 Acquired Local Oklahoma Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2007-03-16 Acquired Commercial State Bank in Sinton, Texas.
Total assets: $68,250,000
Total deposits: $63,851,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
International Bank of Commerce, National Association, San An does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with International Bank of Commerce, National Association, San An, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and International Bank of Commerce, National Association, San An will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3496