Mississippi – Tishomingo – Iuka
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Mississippi
Tishomingo
Iuka
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10589
1912
FDIC Certificate Number: 10589
FDIC's unique number: 6787
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms
Federal Reserve ID Number: 841744
Report Date: 1996-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-04-21
1912-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Iuka Guaranty Bank.
1986-06-05 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1997-03-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Mississippi in Tupelo, Mississippi.
1997-06-20 Changed name to Bancorpsouth Bank .
1997-06-20 Acquired Volunteer Bank in Jackson, Tennessee.
1998-10-30 Acquired First Community Bank Of The South in Fort Deposit, Alabama.
1998-10-30 Acquired Highland Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
1998-12-04 Acquired Merchants Bank in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1998-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Opelika in Opelika, Alabama.
1999-02-27 Acquired The Home Bank in Guntersville, Alabama.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Bank Of North Arkansas in Melbourne, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of El Dorado in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The City National Bank Of Fort Smith in Fort Smith, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Hope in Hope, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Bank in Stuttgart, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Merchants And Planters Bank, National Association in Camden, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Magnolia in Magnolia, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First Republic Bank in Monroe, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired Firstbank in Texarkana, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fredonia State Bank in Nacogdoches, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired City Bank & Trust Of Shreveport, Louisiana in Shreveport, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Trust Company, National Association in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Texarkana, Arkansas.
2002-02-28 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2004-12-31 Acquired Premier Bank Of Brentwood in Brentwood, Tennessee.
2004-12-31 Acquired The Business Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2005-12-01 Acquired American State Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired First Kensington Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2007-07-02 Acquired The Signature Bank in Springfield, Missouri.
Total assets: $117,357,000
Total deposits: $101,112,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Iuka Guaranty Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Iuka Guaranty Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Iuka Guaranty Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14648