Delaware – Kent – Harrington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Delaware
Kent
Harrington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4810
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 4810
FDIC's unique number: 3214
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 36018
Report Date: 1997-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3883
The date of the last data update: 1997-11-14
1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Harrington.
1984-04-09 Changed name to Jcpenney National Bank .
1997-10-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Wyoming in Wyoming, Delaware.
Total assets: $174,616,000
Total deposits: $111,221,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
JCPenney National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with JCPenney National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and JCPenney National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12041