Texas – Bexar – San Antonio
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.jeffersonbank.com
Texas
Bexar
San Antonio
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
16470
1946
FDIC Certificate Number: 16470
FDIC's unique number: 10634
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin
Federal Reserve ID Number: 45560
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-02-19
1946-08-12 Institution established. Original name: Jefferson State Bank.
1993-01-01 Acquired Leon Valley Bank in Bexar County, Texas.
2007-06-13 Changed name to Jefferson Bank .
Total assets: $859,112,000
Total deposits: $734,548,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $734,548,000
Equity capital: $76,418,000
Net income: $5,987,000
Return on Assets: 1.44
Return on Equity: 16.36
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Jefferson Bancshares, Inc.
Jefferson Bank - Blanco Road Branch
Jefferson Bank - Boerne Banking Center Branch
Jefferson Bank - Broadway Branch
Jefferson Bank - Jefferson Bank
Jefferson Bank - Leon Valley Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Jefferson Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Jefferson Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Jefferson Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25603