Kansas – Jefferson – Valley Falls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.kendallstatebank.com
Kansas
Jefferson
Valley Falls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
16471
1892
FDIC Certificate Number: 16471
FDIC's unique number: 10635
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 366854
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1892-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Kendall State Bank.
1986-05-01 Acquired Bank Of Nortonville in Nortonville, Kansas.
Total assets: $32,355,000
Total deposits: $29,245,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $29,245,000
Equity capital: $3,029,000
Net income: $71,000
Return on Assets: 0.41
Return on Equity: 4.73
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Northeast Kansas Bancshares, Inc.
Kendall State Bank - Kendall State Bank
Kendall State Bank - Nortonville Branch
Kendall State Bank - Winchester Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Kendall State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Kendall State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Kendall State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25602