Kentucky – Boyd – Ashland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Boyd
Ashland
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
22437
1977
FDIC Certificate Number: 22437
FDIC's unique number: 15636
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 998116
Report Date: 2003-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-05-21
1977-03-28 Institution established. Original name: The Greenup County Bank.
1988-03-17 Changed name to The Greenup County Bank, Inc. .
1988-12-06 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1992-03-17 Changed name to Kentucky Bank & Trust Of Greenup County .
1992-04-14 Moved bank headquarters from Greenup, Kentucky to Russell, Kentucky.
1997-09-29 Moved bank headquarters from Russell, Kentucky to Ashland, Kentucky.
1997-09-29 Changed name to Kentucky Bank & Trust .
2003-05-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peoples Bank, National Association in Marietta, Ohio.
Total assets: $143,611,000
Total deposits: $115,380,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Kentucky Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Kentucky Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Kentucky Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11626