Vermont – Chittenden – Burlington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Vermont
Chittenden
Burlington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
14127
1847
FDIC Certificate Number: 14127
FDIC's unique number: 8825
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 28303
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23277
The date of the last data update: 1997-07-21
1847-11-06 Institution established. Original name: Burlington Savings Bank.
1983-08-25 Changed name to Bank Of Vermont .
1983-08-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-04-05 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1995-01-27 Changed name to Key Bank Of Vermont .
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-01-13 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.
Total assets: $655,751,000
Total deposits: $480,088,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
KeyBank National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with KeyBank National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and KeyBank National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22405