Kentucky – Nelson – Chaplin
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.kingsouthernbank.com
Kentucky
Nelson
Chaplin
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
18900
1920
FDIC Certificate Number: 18900
FDIC's unique number: 12748
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 909541
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-05-10
1920-01-19 Institution established. Original name: Peoples State Bank.
2003-07-01 Changed name to King Southern Bank .
2006-05-05 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2006-05-05 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $177,023,000
Total deposits: $127,051,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $127,051,000
Equity capital: $14,724,000
Net income: $1,226,000
Return on Assets: 1.39
Return on Equity: 16.78
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: King Bancorp, Inc.
King Southern Bank - Bloomfield Branch
King Southern Bank - Jeffersontown Branch
King Southern Bank - King Southern Bank
King Southern Bank - Louisville Branch
King Southern Bank - Middletown Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
King Southern Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with King Southern Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and King Southern Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10036