New Hampshire – Belknap – Laconia
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Belknap
Laconia
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6231
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 6231
FDIC's unique number: 4202
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 264905
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 4037
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Laconia Peoples National Bank And Trust Company.
1982-12-11 Acquired The Franklin National Bank in Franklin, New Hampshire.
1988-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Central Bank in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1990-01-05 Acquired Wolfeboro National Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $166,273,000
Total deposits: $149,594,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Laconia Peoples National Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Laconia Peoples National Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Laconia Peoples National Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21089