New Hampshire
Grafton
Lebanon
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
33348
1991
FDIC Certificate Number: 33348
FDIC's unique number: 46927
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1845123
Report Date: 1996-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1997-02-24
1991-03-28 Institution established. Original name: Landmark Bank.
1994-03-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1997-01-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Lake Sunapee Bank, FSB in Newport, New Hampshire.
1999-10-30 Acquired New London Trust F.S.B. in New London, New Hampshire.
2007-06-01 Acquired First Brandon National Bank in Brandon, Vermont.
2007-10-02 Acquired First Community Bank in Woodstock, Vermont.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $54,557,000
Total deposits: $50,461,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Landmark Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Landmark Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Landmark Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23477