Indiana – Madison – Lapel
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Indiana
Madison
Lapel
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31834
1923
FDIC Certificate Number: 31834
FDIC's unique number: 44668
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 224374
Report Date: 1981-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Lapel Savings And Loan Association.
1981-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American Federal Savings and Loan Association in Anderson, Indiana.
1986-01-31 Moved bank headquarters from Lapel, Indiana to Anderson, Indiana.
1988-04-29 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Lapel Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Lapel Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Lapel Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23126