Vermont – Windsor – Norwich
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.ledyardbank.com
Vermont
Windsor
Norwich
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
33418
1991
FDIC Certificate Number: 33418
FDIC's unique number: 47078
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1863097
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22210
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-30
1991-05-22 Institution established. Original name: Ledyard National Bank.
1993-07-29 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1996-01-05 Moved bank headquarters from Hanover, New Hampshire to Norwich, Vermont.
Total assets: $383,442,000
Total deposits: $302,769,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $302,769,000
Equity capital: $34,744,000
Net income: $1,359,000
Return on Assets: 0.7
Return on Equity: 8.02
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ledyard Financial Group, Inc.
Ledyard National Bank - Drive-Up Branch
Ledyard National Bank - Hanover Branch
Ledyard National Bank - Ledyard National Bank
Ledyard National Bank - Lyme Branch
Ledyard National Bank - New London Branch - Retail
No associations
LandOfFree
Ledyard National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Ledyard National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ledyard National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5875