Florida – Collier – Naples
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Florida
Collier
Naples
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
58135
2006
FDIC Certificate Number: 58135
FDIC's unique number: 440385
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3354713
Report Date: 2009-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2010-02-19
2006-04-01 Institution established. Original name: Liberty Bank.
2010-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Liberty Bank, F.S.B. in West Des Moines, Iowa.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $148,658,000
Total deposits: $147,055,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Liberty Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Liberty Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Liberty Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27301