Georgia – Rockdale – Conyers
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.libertywebbank.com
Georgia
Rockdale
Conyers
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
34506
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34506
FDIC's unique number: 57784
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2596619
Report Date: 2004-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23349
The date of the last data update: 2005-02-15
1997-10-14 Institution established. Original name: Rockdale National Bank.
2001-11-01 Changed name to Liberty National Bank .
2005-02-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Community Bank in Blairsville, Georgia.
2006-04-01 Acquired United Community Bank Tennessee in Lenoir City, Tennessee.
2006-12-01 Acquired Southern National Bank in Marietta, Georgia.
2007-07-16 Acquired First Bank Of The South in Lawrenceville, Georgia.
2008-02-01 Acquired United Community Bank in Murphy, North Carolina.
2009-06-19 Acquired Southern Community Bank in Fayetteville, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $209,206,000
Total deposits: $160,985,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Liberty National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Liberty National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Liberty National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3773