New Hampshire – Grafton – Lisbon
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Grafton
Lisbon
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
18414
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 18414
FDIC's unique number: 12320
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 564306
Report Date: 1970-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15737
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Lisbon National Bank.
1970-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Littleton National Bank in Littleton, New Hampshire.
1975-10-01 Changed name to Lafayette National Bank .
1975-10-01 Acquired The Woodsville National Bank in Woodsville, New Hampshire.
1981-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Indian Head Bank - North in Littleton, New Hampshire.
1985-07-15 Acquired The Whitefield Savings Bank & Trust Company in Whitefield, New Hampshire.
1988-07-08 Changed name to Indian Head Bank North .
1989-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet Bank-NH in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1992-01-30 Acquired Atlantic Trust Company in Newington, New Hampshire.
1995-12-30 Acquired Shawmut Bank Nh in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1997-05-23 Moved bank headquarters from Nashua, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Lisbon National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Lisbon National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Lisbon National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26445