Maine – Androscoggin – Livermore Falls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Maine
Androscoggin
Livermore Falls
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12725
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 12725
FDIC's unique number: 8069
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 324706
Report Date: 1998-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-02-26
1895-03-25 Institution established. Original name: Livermore Falls Trust Company.
1987-08-13 Reorganized.
1999-01-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Androscoggin Savings Bank in Lewiston, Maine.
Total assets: $70,528,000
Total deposits: $56,521,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Livermore Falls Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Livermore Falls Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Livermore Falls Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5343