Texas – Nueces – Robstown
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Texas
Nueces
Robstown
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30629
1953
FDIC Certificate Number: 30629
FDIC's unique number: 43463
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 324573
Report Date: 1983-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1953-06-29 Institution established. Original name: Lone Star Savings Association.
1983-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Guardian Savings and Loan Association in Dallas, Texas.
1984-09-30 Moved bank headquarters from Robstown, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
1988-04-30 Acquired Truman Savings And Loan Association in North Miami Beach, Florida.
1989-02-28 Acquired California Professional Savings And Loan Association in Beverly Hills, California.
2000-09-28 Changed name to Guardian Savings Bank .
2001-09-01 Changed name to Encore Bank .
2007-03-30 Changed name to Encore Bank, National Association .
2007-03-30 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2007-03-30 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2007-03-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2007-03-30 Moved bank headquarters from Houston, Texas to Naples, Florida.
2007-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Encore Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Lone Star Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Lone Star Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Lone Star Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6995