Wisconsin – Winnebago – Oshkosh
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Winnebago
Oshkosh
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19496
1965
FDIC Certificate Number: 19496
FDIC's unique number: 13296
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 47546
Report Date: 1994-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-11-17
1965-10-11 Institution established. Original name: Western State Bank.
1979-04-02 Changed name to M&i; Western State Bank .
1994-10-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank, National Association in Neenah, Wisconsin.
1998-11-12 Reorganized.
2001-04-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank, National Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank Lakeshore, National Association in Manitowoc, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank North in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-05-25 Acquired Associated Bank South Central in Madison, Wisconsin.
2003-09-12 Acquired Associated Card Services Bank, National Association in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2003-11-21 Acquired Associated Bank Illinois, National Association in Rockford, Illinois.
2005-02-19 Acquired First Federal Capital Bank in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2005-07-15 Acquired Associated Bank Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-10-21 Reorganized.
2005-11-04 Acquired State Financial Bank, National Association in Hales Corners, Wisconsin.
2007-06-29 Acquired The First National Bank Of Hudson in Woodbury, Minnesota.
Total assets: $87,614,000
Total deposits: $75,341,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
M&I Western State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with M&I Western State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and M&I Western State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11082