Minnesota – Washington – Forest Lake
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Washington
Forest Lake
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
1909
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 1909
FDIC's unique number: 1274
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 371353
Report Date: 2009-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-09-01
1903-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Chisago County State Bank.
1994-04-13 Moved bank headquarters from Center City, Minnesota to Forest Lake, Minnesota.
1994-04-13 Changed name to The County Bank .
2001-11-16 Acquired Southview Bank in South St. Paul, Minnesota.
2001-11-16 Changed name to Mainstreet Bank .
2008-02-29 Acquired First Bank And Trust in Hudson, Wisconsin.
2009-08-28 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Central Bank in Stillwater, Minnesota.
2009-08-28 FDIC closing information for
Mainstreet Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/mainstreet-mn.html.
2009-10-23 Acquired Riverview Community Bank in Otsego, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-11-20 Acquired Commerce Bank Of Southwest Florida in Fort Myers, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-15 Acquired Rosemount National Bank in Rosemount, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-10-07 Acquired The Riverbank in Wyoming, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $458,533,000
Total deposits: $432,818,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mainstreet Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mainstreet Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mainstreet Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12913