New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
17238
1846
FDIC Certificate Number: 17238
FDIC's unique number: 11265
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 387701
Report Date: 1970-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-08
1846-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Manchester Savings Bank.
1970-11-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Manchester Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1981-04-01 Changed name to Bankeast .
1981-04-01 Acquired The Colonial Bank in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1983-01-01 Acquired Bankeast, National Association in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1983-01-01 Acquired Bankeast/lakes Region in Meredith, New Hampshire.
1984-10-01 Acquired Kingswood Trust And Savings Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1985-12-01 Acquired First Citizens National Bank in Newport, New Hampshire.
1987-11-01 Acquired Hanover Bank & Trust Company in Hanover, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Manchester Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Manchester Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Manchester Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6031