Missouri – Audrain – Mexico
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.martinsburgbank.com
Missouri
Audrain
Mexico
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
8270
1893
FDIC Certificate Number: 8270
FDIC's unique number: 5276
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 810553
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1893-04-03 Institution established. Original name: Martinsburg Bank.
1988-04-05 Moved bank headquarters from Martinsburg, Missouri to Mexico, Missouri.
1996-01-09 Changed name to Martinsburg Bank And Trust .
Total assets: $175,494,000
Total deposits: $133,992,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $133,992,000
Equity capital: $20,103,000
Net income: $1,254,000
Return on Assets: 1.42
Return on Equity: 12.94
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Martinsburg Bancorp, Inc.
Martinsburg Bank And Trust - Centralia Branch
Martinsburg Bank And Trust - Hallsville Branch
Martinsburg Bank And Trust - Martinsburg Bank And Trust
Martinsburg Bank And Trust - Martinsburg Bank And Trust
Martinsburg Bank And Trust - Martinsburg Bank And Trust Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Martinsburg Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Martinsburg Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Martinsburg Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16296