Wisconsin
Dodge
Mayville
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
30585
1922
FDIC Certificate Number: 30585
FDIC's unique number: 43419
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee
Federal Reserve ID Number: 411576
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mayville Savings And Loan Association.
1993-01-27 Changed name to Mayville Savings Bank .
1993-01-27 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
Total assets: $54,476,000
Total deposits: $45,133,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $45,133,000
Equity capital: $4,972,000
Net income: $-4,000
Return on Assets: -0.01
Return on Equity: -0.16
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
Mayville Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mayville Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mayville Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21710