Kansas – Crawford – Mc Cune
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Crawford
Mc Cune
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14111
1800
FDIC Certificate Number: 14111
FDIC's unique number: 8818
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 139254
Report Date: 1986-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1800-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mccune State Bank.
1986-07-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank of Pittsburg in Pittsburg, Kansas.
1999-08-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
2001-03-01 Acquired The Centennial Bank in Breckenridge Hills, Missouri.
2004-08-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Peoria, Illinois.
2006-09-01 Acquired West Pointe Bank And Trust Company in Belleville, Illinois.
2007-04-01 Acquired Bank South in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
2007-07-02 Acquired Commerce Bank in Aurora, Colorado.
2008-10-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Wichita, Kansas.
2008-10-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
2011-06-29 Changed name to Commerce Bank .
2011-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2011-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $9,134,000
Total deposits: $8,673,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
McCune State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with McCune State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and McCune State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4937