Florida – Collier – Naples
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Florida
Collier
Naples
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
25875
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 25875
FDIC's unique number: 32118
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida
Federal Reserve ID Number: 66538
Report Date: 1997-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1997-12-12
1985-02-01 Institution established. Original name: Mercantile Bank Of Naples.
1997-11-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Naples in Naples, Florida.
2001-02-16 Changed name to First National Bank Of Florida .
2001-02-16 Acquired First National Bank Of Fort Myers in Fort Myers, Florida.
2001-02-16 Acquired Cape Coral National Bank in Cape Coral, Florida.
2001-06-15 Acquired Citizens Community Bank Of Florida in Marco Island, Florida.
2002-01-31 Acquired Bank Of Central Florida in Orange County, Florida.
2003-10-11 Acquired Southern Exchange Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2004-09-03 Acquired Southern Community Bank Of Central Florida in Orlando, Florida.
2004-09-03 Acquired Southern Community Bank Of Southwest Florida in Bonita Springs, Florida.
2004-09-03 Acquired Southern Community Bank Of South Florida in Boca Raton, Florida.
2004-11-30 Acquired First Bradenton Bank in Bradenton, Florida.
2005-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2005-02-28 Acquired First National Wealth Management Company in Naples, Florida.
2008-10-31 Acquired Freedom Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.
Total assets: $117,148,000
Total deposits: $104,693,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mercantile Bank of Naples does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mercantile Bank of Naples, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mercantile Bank of Naples will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11370