North Carolina – Edgecombe – Macclesfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
North Carolina
Edgecombe
Macclesfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11854
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 11854
FDIC's unique number: 7574
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Raleigh
Federal Reserve ID Number: 884321
Report Date: 1973-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1916-01-18 Institution established. Original name: Merchants & Farmers Bank.
1973-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southern Bank and Trust Company in Mount Olive, North Carolina.
1986-12-29 Acquired Tarheel Bank & Trust Co. in Gatesville, North Carolina.
1993-07-10 Acquired Citizens Savings Bank, Inc. in Rocky Mount, North Carolina.
1998-05-15 Acquired Enfield Savings Bank, Inc., SSB in Enfield, North Carolina.
2011-09-23 Acquired Bank Of The Commonwealth in Norfolk, Virginia as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $3,070,000
Total deposits: $2,487,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Merchants & Farmers Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Merchants & Farmers Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants & Farmers Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8111