New Hampshire – Belknap – Meredith
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Belknap
Meredith
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17179
1924
FDIC Certificate Number: 17179
FDIC's unique number: 11213
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 577100
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1924-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Meredith Trust Company.
1978-05-11 Changed name to Meredith Bank & Trust .
1984-11-01 Reorganized.
1988-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Central Bank in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1990-01-05 Acquired Wolfeboro National Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $35,411,000
Total deposits: $32,167,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Meredith Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Meredith Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Meredith Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3715