Maine – Franklin – Farmington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Maine
Franklin
Farmington
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4258
1890
FDIC Certificate Number: 4258
FDIC's unique number: 2792
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 472700
Report Date: 1986-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 4459
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1890-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Farmington.
1975-04-22 Changed name to Firstbank, N. A. .
1983-01-01 Acquired Houlton Trust Company in Houlton, Maine.
1983-01-01 Changed name to Merrill Bank, National Association .
1983-01-01 Acquired Washburn Trust Company in Washburn, Maine.
1986-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Merrill Trust Company in Bangor, Maine.
1988-01-01 Changed name to Merrill/norstar Bank .
1988-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Farmington, Maine to Portland, Maine.
1988-01-01 Acquired Norstar Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
1988-09-01 Changed name to Fleet Bank Of Maine .
1991-02-01 Acquired Maine Savings Bank in Portland, Maine.
1991-07-14 Acquired New Maine National Bank in Portland, Maine.
2000-10-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $108,506,000
Total deposits: $92,415,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Merrill Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Merrill Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merrill Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8575