Kentucky – Jefferson – Louisville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.metrobankky.com
Kentucky
Jefferson
Louisville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34308
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34308
FDIC's unique number: 57067
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2496081
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-01-06
1997-01-06 Institution established. Original name: Louisville Community Development Bank.
2011-01-03 Changed name to Metro Bank .
Total assets: $31,572,000
Total deposits: $26,854,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $26,854,000
Equity capital: $4,336,000
Net income: $-219,000
Return on Assets: -1.28
Return on Equity: -9.94
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Louisville Development Bancorp, Inc.
No associations
LandOfFree
Metro Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Metro Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Metro Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15173