Maryland – Montgomery – Bethesda
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Maryland
Montgomery
Bethesda
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30583
1951
FDIC Certificate Number: 30583
FDIC's unique number: 43417
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 314378
Report Date: 1987-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10
1951-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Metropolitan Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-08-31 Acquired County Federal Savings And Loan Association in Rockville, Maryland.
1987-09-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $564,104,000
Total deposits: $429,884,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Metropolitan Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Metropolitan Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Metropolitan Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21705