Texas – Tarrant – Hurst
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Tarrant
Hurst
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
23447
1981
FDIC Certificate Number: 23447
FDIC's unique number: 16430
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 542050
Report Date: 2000-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17010
The date of the last data update: 2000-07-28
1981-05-11 Institution established. Original name: Mid-cities National Bank.
2000-06-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Texas. National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2000-10-05 Moved bank headquarters from Hurst, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2001-05-18 Acquired Citizens National Bank Of Texas in Bellaire, Texas.
2002-11-09 Acquired Bank Of Tanglewood, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2004-10-31 Acquired Bank Of Texas Trust Company, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2011-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BOKF, National Association in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $95,573,000
Total deposits: $78,555,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mid-Cities National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mid-Cities National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mid-Cities National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18853