Iowa – Jasper – Newton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Iowa
Jasper
Newton
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28017
1913
FDIC Certificate Number: 28017
FDIC's unique number: 40851
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 916071
Report Date: 1999-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1999-06-23
1913-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mid Iowa Savings And Loan Association.
1991-02-19 Changed name to Mid-iowa Savings Bank, Fsb .
1991-02-19 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1992-10-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-01-24 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-04-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Bank in Sioux City, Iowa.
2007-09-04 Changed name to Vantus Bank .
2009-09-04 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Great Southern Bank in Reeds Spring, Missouri.
2009-09-04 FDIC closing information for
Vantus Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/vantus.html.
2011-10-07 Acquired Sun Security Bank in Ellington, Missouri as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $149,242,000
Total deposits: $102,064,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mid-Iowa Savings Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mid-Iowa Savings Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mid-Iowa Savings Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15316