Kansas – Leavenworth – Leavenworth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Leavenworth
Leavenworth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
4713
1883
FDIC Certificate Number: 4713
FDIC's unique number: 3135
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 29252
Report Date: 2009-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3033
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-24
1883-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Leavenworth National Bank And Trust Company.
1998-07-15 Changed name to Midamerican Bank And Trust Company, National Association .
2009-11-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Country Club Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
Total assets: $112,783,000
Total deposits: $101,215,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
MidAmerican Bank and Trust Company, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with MidAmerican Bank and Trust Company, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and MidAmerican Bank and Trust Company, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17026