Kentucky – Bell – Middlesboro
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Kentucky
Bell
Middlesboro
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28826
1915
FDIC Certificate Number: 28826
FDIC's unique number: 41660
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 456773
Report Date: 2001-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2002-02-19
1915-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Middlesboro Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1991-01-16 Changed name to Middlesboro Federal Bank, Federal Savings Bank .
1991-01-16 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1994-03-04 Changed name to Middlesboro Federal Bank, Fsb .
1994-03-04 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commercial Bank in Harrogate, Tennessee.
2008-09-06 Acquired The Union National Bank And Trust Company Of Barbourville in Barbourville, Kentucky.
Total assets: $125,274,000
Total deposits: $109,192,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Middlesboro Federal Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Middlesboro Federal Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Middlesboro Federal Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9344