Iowa – Pottawattamie – Council Bluffs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.midstatesbank.com
Iowa
Pottawattamie
Council Bluffs
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
4465
1913
FDIC Certificate Number: 4465
FDIC's unique number: 2950
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha
Federal Reserve ID Number: 728948
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 10354
Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1913-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Harlan National Bank.
1996-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank in Missouri Valley, Iowa.
1996-12-31 Changed name to Midstates Bank, National Association .
1996-12-31 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Avoca, Iowa.
2004-05-11 Moved bank headquarters from Harlan, Iowa to Council Bluffs, Iowa.
Total assets: $326,914,000
Total deposits: $221,655,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $221,655,000
Equity capital: $40,015,000
Net income: $2,580,000
Return on Assets: 1.61
Return on Equity: 13.67
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Midstates Bancshares, Inc.
Midstates Bank, National Association - Avoca Branch
Midstates Bank, National Association - Council Bluffs Branch
Midstates Bank, National Association - Main Office Branch
Midstates Bank, National Association - Midstates Bank, National
Midstates Bank, National Association - Missouri Valley Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Midstates Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Midstates Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Midstates Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18538