Texas – Mills – Goldthwaite
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.mcsbtexas.com
Texas
Mills
Goldthwaite
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15669
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 15669
FDIC's unique number: 9943
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 522753
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1908-11-24 Institution established. Original name: Mills County State Bank.
1986-12-08 Reorganized.
Total assets: $208,333,000
Total deposits: $181,746,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $181,746,000
Equity capital: $23,449,000
Net income: $1,257,000
Return on Assets: 1.22
Return on Equity: 11.01
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Goldthwaite Bancshares, Inc.
Mills County State Bank - Brownwood Branch
Mills County State Bank - Early Branch
Mills County State Bank - Mills County State Bank
Mills County State Bank - Mills County State Bank Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Mills County State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mills County State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mills County State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12071