Minnesota – Dakota – Saint Paul
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.minnwestbank.com
Minnesota
Dakota
Saint Paul
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
17898
1958
FDIC Certificate Number: 17898
FDIC's unique number: 11837
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 790851
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-11-24
1958-08-18 Institution established. Original name: Rochester State Bank Of Rochester, Minnesota.
1974-03-01 Changed name to Rochester Bank And Trust Company Of Rochester .
1994-04-30 Acquired Security State Bank Of Hammond in Hammond, Minnesota.
1994-06-01 Changed name to Rochester Bank .
1994-06-07 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2006-11-09 Changed name to Minnwest Bank Metro .
2008-10-15 Moved bank headquarters from Rochester, Minnesota to Eagan, Minnesota.
Total assets: $259,940,000
Total deposits: $214,687,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $214,687,000
Equity capital: $21,940,000
Net income: $-1,843,000
Return on Assets: -1.4
Return on Equity: -17.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Minnwest Corporation
Minnwest Bank Metro - Hammond Branch
Minnwest Bank Metro - Minnetonka Branch
Minnwest Bank Metro - Minnwest Bank Metro
Minnwest Bank Metro - Rochester Office
No associations
LandOfFree
Minnwest Bank Metro does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Minnwest Bank Metro, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Minnwest Bank Metro will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2233