California – San Luis Obispo – San Luis Obispo
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.missioncommunitybank.com
California
San Luis Obispo
San Luis Obispo
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
34462
1997
FDIC Certificate Number: 34462
FDIC's unique number: 57226
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2640530
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-02
1997-12-18 Institution established. Original name: Mission Community Bank, National Association.
2000-12-15 Reorganized.
2003-12-29 Changed name to Mission Community Bank .
2003-12-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2003-12-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $212,460,000
Total deposits: $191,156,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $191,156,000
Equity capital: $19,983,000
Net income: $-496,000
Return on Assets: -0.49
Return on Equity: -5.07
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Scj, Inc.
Mission Community Bank - Administration Branch
Mission Community Bank - Arroyo Grande Branch
Mission Community Bank - Food & Agribusiness Division Lpo Bra
Mission Community Bank - Main Office - Prado Branch
Mission Community Bank - Mission Community Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Mission Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mission Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mission Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6136