New Hampshire
Cheshire
Jaffrey
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
18011
1869
FDIC Certificate Number: 18011
FDIC's unique number: 11941
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 495606
Report Date: 1976-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-14
1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Monadnock Savings Bank.
1976-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Monadnock Bank in Jaffrey, New Hampshire.
1988-05-31 Reorganized.
1990-10-18 Acquired Village Savings Bank in Greenville, New Hampshire.
1993-07-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Cheshire County Savings Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1993-11-15 Changed name to Cfx Bank .
1993-11-15 Acquired The Valley Bank in Hillsborough, New Hampshire.
1996-07-02 Acquired Milford Co-operative Bank in Milford, New Hampshire.
1996-07-23 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-08-29 Acquired Portsmouth Savings Bank in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1997-08-29 Acquired Concord Savings Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1997-08-29 Acquired Centerpoint Bank in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-04-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-05-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of New Hampshire, National Association in Farmington, New Hampshire.
2002-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankNorth, National Association in Portland, Maine.
2002-07-26 Acquired Ipswich Savings Bank in Ipswich, Massachusetts.
2002-08-31 Acquired Southington Savings Bank in Southington, Connecticut.
2002-12-31 Acquired Warren Five Cents Savings Bank in Peabody, Massachusetts.
2003-02-14 Acquired American Savings Bank in New Britain, Connecticut.
2003-12-31 Acquired First & Ocean National Bank in Seabrook, New Hampshire.
2004-04-30 Acquired Cape Cod Bank And Trust, National Association in Hyannis, Massachusetts.
2004-04-30 Acquired Foxborough Savings Bank in Foxboro, Massachusetts.
2005-01-21 Acquired Boston Federal Savings Bank in Burlington, Massachusetts.
2005-05-23 Changed name to Td Banknorth, National Association .
2006-01-31 Acquired Hudson United Bank in Mahwah, New Jersey.
2007-01-01 Acquired Interchange Bank in Saddle Brook, New Jersey.
2008-05-31 Changed name to Td Bank, National Association .
2008-05-31 Moved bank headquarters from Portland, Maine to Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank/north in Ramsey, New Jersey.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Monadnock Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Monadnock Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Monadnock Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19910