West Virginia – Randolph – Elkins
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.mountainvalleybank.com
West Virginia
Randolph
Elkins
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
6786
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 6786
FDIC's unique number: 4560
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1011432
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9610
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Parsons.
1989-04-04 Reorganized.
1992-10-01 Acquired Bank Of Mill Creek in Mill Creek, West Virginia.
1992-10-01 Changed name to Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. .
1992-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from Parsons, West Virginia to Elkins, West Virginia.
Total assets: $114,030,000
Total deposits: $96,630,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $96,630,000
Equity capital: $15,204,000
Net income: $476,000
Return on Assets: 0.84
Return on Equity: 6.36
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Mountain-Valley Bancshares, Inc.
Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. - Elkins Branch
Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. - Mill Creek Branch
Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. - Mountain Valley Bank, N.A.
Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. - Parsons Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mountain Valley Bank, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10357