Kentucky – Grant – Dry Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Grant
Dry Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8780
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 8780
FDIC's unique number: 5591
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 360311
Report Date: 1976-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1903-08-18 Institution established. Original name: Mt. Zion Deposit Bank.
1976-06-25 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $625,000
Total deposits: $663,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mt. Zion Deposit Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mt. Zion Deposit Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mt. Zion Deposit Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2670