Oklahoma – Canadian – Mustang
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Oklahoma
Canadian
Mustang
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
25733
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25733
FDIC's unique number: 17606
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 98258
Report Date: 1987-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18367
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1984-09-10 Institution established. Original name: Mustang National Bank.
1987-09-17 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Moore in Moore, Oklahoma.
1991-06-15 Changed name to The First Bank .
1991-06-15 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
1996-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Will Rogers Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2001-08-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Intrust Bank, National Association in Wichita, Kansas.
2007-03-16 Acquired First State Bank in Junction City, Kansas.
Total assets: $12,091,000
Total deposits: $11,521,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mustang National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mustang National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mustang National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20891