New Mexico – Doña Ana – Las Cruces
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Mexico
Doña Ana
Las Cruces
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29139
1926
FDIC Certificate Number: 29139
FDIC's unique number: 41973
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albuquerque
Federal Reserve ID Number: 635073
Report Date: 1993-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1993-10-07
1926-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mutual Building And Loan Association Of Las Cruces.
1985-04-30 Changed name to Mutual Building And Loan Association FA .
1985-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1993-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Savings Bank in Roswell, New Mexico.
1998-12-04 Changed name to First Federal Bank .
2005-06-01 Acquired Gallup Federal Savings Bank in Gallup, New Mexico.
2007-02-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Washington Federal Savings and Loan Association in Seattle, Washington.
2008-02-01 Acquired First Mutual Bank in Bellevue, Washington.
2010-01-08 Acquired Horizon Bank in Bellingham, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-07 Changed name to Washington Federal .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $84,096,000
Total deposits: $79,512,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Mutual Building and Loan Association FA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Mutual Building and Loan Association FA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mutual Building and Loan Association FA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3771