Maryland – Cecil – Rising Sun
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.nbrs.com
Maryland
Cecil
Rising Sun
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
4862
1880
FDIC Certificate Number: 4862
FDIC's unique number: 3239
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 368429
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-01
1880-07-01 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Rising Sun.
1991-02-15 Reorganized.
2002-06-14 Changed name to Nbrs Financial .
2002-06-14 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2002-06-14 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $260,201,000
Total deposits: $239,713,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $239,713,000
Equity capital: $17,437,000
Net income: $297,000
Return on Assets: 0.23
Return on Equity: 3.75
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Rising Sun Bancorp
Nbrs Financial - Aberdeen Branch
Nbrs Financial - Bel Air Branch
Nbrs Financial - Dublin Branch
Nbrs Financial - Elkton Branch
Nbrs Financial - Harve De Grace Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
NBRS Financial does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with NBRS Financial, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and NBRS Financial will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15202